+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ20ER)
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Taken up
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 000334480
- Prefiled; 01/05/00
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor