+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ2ER)
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 073959316
On November 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/09/08 073959316
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor