+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Consumer Protection and the Bureau of Insurance
- With letter to Center for Quality Health Care Services
- Passed by in Rules (15-Y 2-N)
- Letter to Center for Quality Health Care Services and
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Printed as engrossed 005607230-E
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 005607230
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2000: Passed by in Rules (15-Y 2-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor