+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ190ER)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from N. & C. (7-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Nominations and Confirmations
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: AGREE TO (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/97 977490713
+ − Votes (5)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from N. & C. (7-Y 0-N)
January 17, 1997: VOTE: AGREE TO (40-Y 0-N)
January 15, 1997: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 1997: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor