+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ188ER)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 16103782D
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 2016: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2016: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2016: Agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
March 4, 2016: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor