+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ188ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 048100740
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 048100740
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor