+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ184ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amendment (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed LD2303753 (SJ184E)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor