+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ183ER)
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 068413726
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 068413726
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor