+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ181ER)
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 004721522
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor