+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ177ER)
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: AGREE TO (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 020709476
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2002: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: AGREE TO (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2002: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor