+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ170ER)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 064463740-S1
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ170S1
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064463740-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 067697740
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor