+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ163ER)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 14105006D
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor