+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ162ER)
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 063865784
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 063865784