+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ160ER)
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 020912452-E
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 020912452
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor