+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ156ER)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 22106590D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor