+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ155ER)
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10103911D
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 10103911D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor