+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ154ER)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented