+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ150ER)
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 063866784
On January 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 063866784
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor