+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ148ER)
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 063839744
On January 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 063839744
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor