+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ148ER)
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10103104D
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 10103104D
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor