+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ148ER)
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 047992748