+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ145ER)
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 088721268
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 088721268