+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ140ER)
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12104070D
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 12104070D