+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ14ER)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/16 16100001D