+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ134ER)
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 047920796
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 047920796
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor