+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ134ER)
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10103939D
On January 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 10103939D
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor