+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ133ER)
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 1-N)
- Taken up
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 022081464-E
- Rules suspended 40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 022081464
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
February 21, 2002: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor