+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ129ER)
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 006741412-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 006741412
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2000: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor