+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ127ER)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N)
- Agreed to by House with amendment (89-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Delegate Tyler agreed to
- Taken up
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N)
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Amendments by Senator Whipple agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ127E
- Printed as engrossed 10104033D-E
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On January 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 10104033D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N)
February 23, 2010: Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N)
February 16, 2010: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor