+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ125ER)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Certificate, Oath and Confirmation
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 12103994D
+ − Votes (6)
February 7, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor