+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ119ER)
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 020854412-E
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 020854412
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor