+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ115ER)
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ115E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 048337784-E
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On January 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 048337784
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor