+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ114ER)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- Passed by temporarily
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: AGREE PART 2 R (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Agreed to by Senate pg5, lines 47-48 (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: AGREE PART 1 R (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate in part (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 006904202-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 006904202
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 9, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2000: VOTE: AGREE PART 1 R (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2000: VOTE: AGREE PART 2 R (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 2, 2000: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2000: Reported from P. & E. with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor