+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ11ER)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 4
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: AGREE TO R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 986591803-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On January 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/12/98 986591803
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
January 23, 1998: VOTE: AGREE TO R (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 1998: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor