+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ104ER)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- Motion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented 14104027D
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor