+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ102ER)
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12103074D
On January 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 12103074D