+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ97ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 961151701