+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ95ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House with amendment (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 981328760-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 981328760-S1
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 981328760-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 980862760
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor