+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ91ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed by temporarily
- House amendments agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments rejected
- Amendments by Mr. Diamonstein agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House with amendments (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 980475727-E
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 980475727
- Referred to Committee on Rules