+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by Rules by voice vote
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ88S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 064450800-S1
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064450800-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065409800
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor