+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Rules by voice vote
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On January 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed