+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Letter to Crime Commission
- Passed by in Rules w/amds (16-Y 1-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 007226480
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2000: Passed by in Rules w/amds (16-Y 1-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor