+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ85ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 981346685-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 981346685-S1
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 981346685-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day in Rules by voice vote
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 988564685
- Referred to Committee on Rules