+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ79ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Amendments by Mr. Behm agreed to
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Mr. McClure rejected (45-Y 53-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (45-Y 53-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- House sub. w/amds. agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Amendment by Mr. Marshall rejected (34-Y 59-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (34-Y 59-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 981213758-H1
- Agreed to by House w/sub. w/amds. (78-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 18-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute with amendments waived
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 981213758-H1
- Agreed to by House with substitute (76-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 22-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed by for the day
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981213758-H1
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 986579758
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (45-Y 53-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (34-Y 59-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 18-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 22-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor