+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ79ER)
On March 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 2-N)
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 044352782-S1
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Delegates: Louderback, Morgan, Pollard
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Obenshain, Bolling, Mims
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ79H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 044338782-H1
- Taken up
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 044338782-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ79E
- Printed as engrossed 047236782-E
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: WAIVE READING (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 047236782
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: WAIVE READING (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor