+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Engrossed by Senate
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985508727
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor