+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ75ER)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ75E
- Printed as engrossed 14102013D-E
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102013D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor