+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ75ER)
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ75E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 043502828-E
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 4
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 043502828
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor