+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0911)
On April 11, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 911 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ73ER)
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 15-N)
- Agreed to by House (85-Y 15-N)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 4-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Rules (7-Y 3-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 965310833
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 15-N)
March 5, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 4-N)
February 27, 1996: Reported from Rules (7-Y 3-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor