+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Rules by voice vote
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (36-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On January 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed